There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Thin Blue Line Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Thin Blue Line Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Thin Blue Line Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to provide additional aggravating factors for the imposition of the death penalty based on the status of the victim.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/18/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 271 - 143 (Roll no. 265).
05/11/2017 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-116.
01/03/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
05/22/2017 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
05/18/2017-4:21pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/18/2017-4:21pm House On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 271 - 143 (Roll no. 265). (text: CR H4333)
05/18/2017-3:57pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4341)
05/18/2017-3:45pm House POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 115, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Conyers demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage of the bill until later in the legislative day.
05/18/2017-3:44pm House The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
05/18/2017-2:50pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 115.
05/18/2017-2:49pm House Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 115 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. The resolution provides that an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 115-17 shall be considered as adopted and the bill, as amended, shall be considered as read.
05/18/2017-2:49pm House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 323. (consideration: CR H4332-4340)
05/17/2017-1:58pm House Rule H. Res. 323 passed House.
05/16/2017-6:39pm House Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 323 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 115 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. The resolution provides that an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 115-17 shall be considered as adopted and the bill, as amended, shall be considered as read.
05/11/2017 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 69.
05/11/2017 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-116.
Action By: House Judiciary
04/27/2017 House Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 12.
Action By: House Judiciary
04/27/2017 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary
01/23/2017 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: House Judiciary
01/03/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
01/03/2017 House Introduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/03/2017 Referred to
04/27/2017 Markup by
05/11/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-116
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations01/23/2017 Referred to
Senate Judiciary05/22/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (9)

  • Crime victims
  • Criminal procedure and sentencing
  • Emergency medical services and trauma care
  • Fires
  • First responders and emergency personnel
  • Health personnel
  • Law enforcement officers
  • Violent crime

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.115. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/18/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on May 11, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Thin Blue Line Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the federal criminal code to expand the list of statutory aggravating factors in death penalty determinations to also include killing or targeting a law enforcement officer, firefighter, or other first responder.