There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Mortgage Choice Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Mortgage Choice Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Mortgage Choice Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Truth in Lending Act to improve upon the definitions provided for points and fees in connection with a mortgage transaction.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
02/08/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 280 - 131 (Roll no. 64).
01/22/2018Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-522.
02/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
02/12/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
02/08/2018-10:58amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/08/2018-10:58amHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 280 - 131 (Roll no. 64).
02/08/2018-10:28amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H981-982)
02/07/2018-6:21pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 1153, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill, and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Hensarling demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage until a time to be announced.
02/07/2018-6:21pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
02/07/2018-9:14amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1153.
02/07/2018-9:13amHouseThe resolution provides for one hour of debate on each measure. The resolution also waives the requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII for a two-thirds vote to consider a report from the Committee on Rules on the same day it is presented to the House with respect to any resolution reported through the legislative day of February 9, 2018. It shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of February 8, 2018 or February 9, 2018 for the Speaker to entertain motions to suspend the rules.
02/07/2018-9:13amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 725. (consideration: CR H906-965; text: CR H907)
02/05/2018-7:23pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 725 Reported to House. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each measure. The resolution also waives the requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII for a two-thirds vote to consider a report from the Committee on Rules on the same day it is presented to the House with respect to any resolution reported through the legislative day of February 9, 2018. It shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of February 8, 2018 or February 9, 2018 for the Speaker to entertain motions to suspend the rules.
01/22/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 387.
01/22/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-522.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
11/14/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 46 - 13.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
11/14/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
02/16/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
02/16/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services02/16/2017 Referred to
11/14/2017 Markup by
01/22/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-522
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs02/12/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1153. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (02/08/2018)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Mortgage Choice Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Truth in Lending Act to specify that neither escrow charges for insurance nor affiliated title charges shall be considered "points and fees" for purposes of determining whether a mortgage is a "high-cost mortgage." (A high-cost mortgage designation restricts the terms of the loan and requires a lender to make certain disclosures to the borrower.)