There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Historic Tax Credit Improvement Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to improve the Historic Rehabilitation Tax Credit, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/16/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/16/2017 Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/16/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (80)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 02/16/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/16/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 03/01/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/01/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 03/01/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/01/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 03/01/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/01/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/01/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/02/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 03/08/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/08/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/08/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/08/2017
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 03/08/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/08/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 03/20/2017
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 03/20/2017
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 03/20/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 03/20/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/27/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/27/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/27/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/27/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/27/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/30/2017
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 03/30/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/12/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 04/12/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 04/12/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 04/12/2017
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 04/25/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/25/2017
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 05/16/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 05/16/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/16/2017
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/16/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/16/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/16/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/25/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 05/25/2017
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/07/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 06/07/2017
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 06/12/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/12/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/15/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/20/2017
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/21/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/21/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 06/21/2017
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/11/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/11/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/11/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/11/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 07/12/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/28/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/28/2017
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/28/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/03/2017
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/03/2017
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 10/25/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/02/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 11/14/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/15/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 11/15/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/16/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (6)

  • Building construction
  • Historic sites and heritage areas
  • Income tax credits
  • Residential rehabilitation and home repair
  • Tax-exempt organizations

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1158. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/16/2017)

Historic Tax Credit Improvement Act of 2017

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the tax credit for the rehabilitation of buildings and historic structures, to: (1) allow an increased 30% credit, up to $750,000, for projects with rehabilitation expenditures not exceeding $3.75 million, for which no credit was allowed in either of the two prior taxable years (smaller projects); (2) allow the transfer of tax credit amounts for smaller projects; (3) treat a building as substantially rehabilitated if rehabilitation expenditures exceed the greater of 50% of the adjusted basis of the building or $5,000 (currently, the greater of the adjusted basis of the building or $5,000); (4) reduce the required basis adjustment from 100% of the credit to 50% of the amount of the credit; and (5) limit the application of disqualified lease rules to tax-exempt use property.