There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

United States and Israel Space Cooperation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

United States and Israel Space Cooperation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for continuing cooperation between the National Aeronautics and Space Administration and the Israel Space Agency, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/20/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 0 (Roll no. 700).(text: CR 12/18/2017 H10161)
02/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/21/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
12/20/2017-1:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/20/2017-1:03pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 0 (Roll no. 700). (text: CR 12/18/2017 H10161)
12/20/2017-12:56pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10312-10313)
12/18/2017-6:06pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/18/2017-5:57pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1159.
12/18/2017-5:57pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10161-10162)
12/18/2017-5:56pmHouseMr. Dunn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/28/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
09/28/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
04/25/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Space.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
02/16/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
02/16/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/02/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/02/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 03/02/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 03/02/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/02/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/02/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/02/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/02/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 03/02/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/02/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/02/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 03/02/2017
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 03/02/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 03/02/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 03/02/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 03/02/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 03/02/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/02/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/02/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/24/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/24/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/24/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 07/14/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 07/14/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/14/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 07/14/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 07/14/2017
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/26/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 09/28/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 09/28/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 09/28/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 12/15/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 12/18/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/18/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Science, Space, and Technology02/16/2017 Referred to
09/28/2017 Markup by
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Space04/25/2017 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations12/21/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1159. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/20/2017)

United States and Israel Space Cooperation Act

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA) to continue to work with the Israel Space Agency in identifying and cooperatively pursuing peaceful space exploration and science initiatives in areas of mutual interest, taking all appropriate measures to protect sensitive information, intellectual property, trade secrets, and economic interests of the United States.