Committees: H.R.1162 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/16/2017 Referred to
05/17/2017 Markup by
05/23/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-147
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health03/03/2017 Referred to
03/29/2017 Hearings by
04/06/2017 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/24/2017 Referred to
12/19/2018 Discharged from