There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Taylor Force Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To condition assistance to the West Bank and Gaza on steps by the Palestinian Authority to end violence and terrorism against Israeli citizens.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/16/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/16/2017 Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/16/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (109)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/07/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/07/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 03/07/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 03/07/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/07/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/07/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/07/2017
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/07/2017
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 03/08/2017
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/08/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 03/10/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 03/10/2017
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/15/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 03/15/2017
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 03/16/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 03/20/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/27/2017
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 04/27/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/01/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/01/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/01/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 05/02/2017
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 05/04/2017
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/04/2017
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 05/04/2017
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 05/04/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 05/04/2017
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/04/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/08/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/16/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 05/16/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 05/17/2017
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 05/17/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/18/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 05/18/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/22/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 05/23/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 05/23/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 05/23/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/23/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 06/06/2017
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/07/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/08/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/08/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 06/12/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/12/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 06/12/2017
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/12/2017
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/12/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 06/12/2017
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 06/13/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 06/15/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/20/2017
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 06/22/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/22/2017
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/22/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 06/22/2017
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/22/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/22/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/26/2017
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 06/27/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/27/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 06/27/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 06/28/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 06/28/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 06/29/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/29/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/29/2017
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/11/2017
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 07/11/2017
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 07/11/2017
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/11/2017
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/12/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 07/17/2017
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/17/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/19/2017
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/19/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/19/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 07/19/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 07/19/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/19/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 07/19/2017
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 07/19/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 07/20/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 07/20/2017
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 07/24/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 07/24/2017
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/24/2017
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/26/2017
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/26/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/26/2017
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/26/2017
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/26/2017
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 07/27/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 07/27/2017
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/27/2017
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 07/28/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 07/28/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/28/2017
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 08/04/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 08/04/2017
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 08/18/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 08/18/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 08/18/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 08/18/2017
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 08/18/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 08/18/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 08/18/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs02/16/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (13)

  • Arab-Israeli relations
  • Congressional oversight
  • Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
  • Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
  • Foreign aid and international relief
  • Gaza Strip
  • Israel
  • Middle East
  • Military personnel and dependents
  • Palestinians
  • Terrorism
  • West Bank

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1164. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/16/2017)

Taylor Force Act

This bill prohibits certain assistance under the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 from being made available for the West Bank and Gaza unless the Department of State certifies that the Palestinian Authority:

  • is taking steps to end acts of violence against U.S. and Israeli citizens perpetrated by individuals under its jurisdictional control, such as the March 2016 attack that killed former Army officer Taylor Force;
  • is publicly condemning such acts of violence and is investigating, or cooperating in investigations of, such acts; and
  • has terminated payments for acts of terrorism against U.S. and Israeli citizens to any individual who has been convicted and imprisoned for such acts, to any individual who died committing such acts, and to family members of such an individual.