There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

ALS Disability Insurance Access Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title II of the Social Security Act to eliminate the five month waiting period for disability insurance benefits for individuals with amyotrophic lateral sclerosis (ALS).


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/16/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/02/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/16/2017 Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/16/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (102)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/16/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/16/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 02/16/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3]* 02/16/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 02/28/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/28/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/28/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/28/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/28/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/28/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/20/2017
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/20/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/20/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 03/20/2017
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/20/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 03/20/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 03/20/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/20/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 03/20/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/20/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 03/20/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/25/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/18/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 05/18/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/18/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 05/18/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 05/18/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/18/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 05/18/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/18/2017
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 05/18/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 05/18/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 05/18/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/18/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/18/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/18/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/18/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/22/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 05/22/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 05/22/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/22/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/22/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/22/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/22/2017
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 05/22/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/22/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/06/2017
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 06/06/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/06/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 06/06/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/06/2017
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/06/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/06/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/06/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 06/06/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/06/2017
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/06/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 06/06/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/06/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 06/13/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/13/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 06/13/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/13/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/13/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/13/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/21/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/26/2017
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/26/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 07/11/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/11/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/11/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/26/2017
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 08/25/2017
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 08/25/2017
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 08/25/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/02/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/16/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security03/02/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (3)

  • Disability assistance
  • Neurological disorders

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1171. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/16/2017)

ALS Disability Insurance Access Act of 2017

This bill amends title II (Old Age, Survivors, and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act to eliminate the five-month waiting period for disability insurance benefits for individuals with amyotrophic lateral sclerosis (a progressive neurodegenerative disease, also known as Lou Gehrig's disease, that affects nerve cells in the brain and spinal cord). Under current law, individuals must wait five months after becoming disabled before their disability insurance benefit payments can begin.