There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1174. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/16/2017)

Fairness For Breastfeeding Mothers Act of 2017

This bill requires that certain public buildings that are open to the public and contain a public restroom provide a lactation room, other than a bathroom, that is hygienic and is available for use by members of the public to express milk. The lactation room must be shielded from public view, be free from intrusion, and contain a chair, a working surface, and (if the building is supplied with electricity) an electrical outlet.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/07/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1550)
03/07/2017 Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-24.
02/16/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
03/08/2017 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
03/07/2017-6:11pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/07/2017-6:11pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1550)
03/07/2017-5:42pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1174.
03/07/2017-5:42pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1550-1553)
03/07/2017-5:42pm House Mr. Barletta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/07/2017 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 10.
03/07/2017 House Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-24.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure
02/28/2017 House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure
02/28/2017 House Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure
02/28/2017 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. Markup report CQ
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure
02/17/2017 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure
02/16/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
02/16/2017 House Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E212)
02/16/2017 House Introduced in House

Titles (3)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House:

Fairness For Breastfeeding Mothers Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced:

Fairness For Breastfeeding Mothers Act of 2017

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To provide a lactation room in public buildings.


Subjects (9)

  • Child health
  • Government buildings, facilities, and property
  • Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
  • Nutrition and diet
  • Right of privacy
  • Smithsonian Institution
  • U.S. Capitol
  • Women's health

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 02/28/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/16/2017 Referred to
02/28/2017 Markup by
03/07/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-24
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management02/17/2017 Referred to
02/28/2017 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works03/08/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

As of 05/25/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1174 - Fairness For Breastfeeding Mothers Act of 2017.