There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Working Families Flexibility Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Working Families Flexibility Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Working Families Flexibility Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to provide compensatory time for employees in the private sector.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/02/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 229 - 197 (Roll no. 244).(text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H3038-3039)
04/28/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 115-101.
02/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
05/03/2017SenateReceived in the Senate.
05/02/2017-5:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/02/2017-5:26pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 229 - 197 (Roll no. 244). (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H3038-3039)
05/02/2017-5:18pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 192 - 234 (Roll no. 243).
05/02/2017-4:52pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
05/02/2017-4:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Scott, VA motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions in the motion seek to report the same back to the House forthwith with the following amendment to add an exemption to the underlying bill for any employee who does not receive fewer than seven paid sick days, which can be used to seek medical care for a pre-existing health condition.
05/02/2017-4:46pmHouseMr. Scott (VA) moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Education and the Workforce. (text: CR H3048)
05/02/2017-4:46pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
05/02/2017-3:43pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1180.
05/02/2017-3:42pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 1180 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The rules also provides for proceedings during the period from May 5, 2017, through May 15, 2017.
05/02/2017-3:42pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 299. (consideration: CR H3038-3050)
05/02/2017-2:38pmHouseRule H. Res. 299 passed House.
05/01/2017-6:36pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 299 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1180 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The rules also provides for proceedings during the period from May 5, 2017, through May 15, 2017.
04/28/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 58.
04/28/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 115-101.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
04/26/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 16.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
04/26/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
04/05/2017HouseHearings Held by the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections Prior to Referral.
Action By: House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Workforce Protections
02/16/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
02/16/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce02/16/2017 Referred to
04/26/2017 Markup by
04/28/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-101
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Workforce Protections04/05/2017 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1180. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/02/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on May 2, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Working Families Flexibility Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to authorize employers to provide compensatory time off to private employees at a rate of not less than 1 1/2 hours for each hour of employment for which overtime compensation is required, but only if it is in accordance with an applicable collective bargaining agreement or, in the absence of such an agreement, an agreement between the employer and employee.

The bill prohibits an employee from accruing more than 160 hours of compensatory time. An employer must provide monetary compensation for any unused compensatory time off accrued during the preceding year.

The bill requires an employer to give employees 30-day notice before discontinuing compensatory time off.

The bill prohibits an employer from intimidating, threatening, or coercing an employee in order to: (1) interfere with the employee's right to request or not to request compensatory time off in lieu of payment of monetary overtime compensation, or (2) require an employee to use such compensatory time.

(Sec. 3) The bill makes an employer who violates such requirements liable to the affected employee in the amount of the compensation rate for each hour of compensatory time accrued, plus an additional equal amount as liquidated damages, reduced for each hour of compensatory time used.

(Sec. 5) The Government Accountability Office must report to Congress on: (1) the extent to which employers provide compensatory time off and employees opt to receive it; (2) the number of complaints filed by employees with the Department of Labor alleging a violation of such requirements and the number of enforcement actions commenced by Labor on behalf of aggrieved employees; (3) the disposition of such complaints and actions; and (4) any unpaid wages, damages, penalties, injunctive relief, or other remedies sought by Labor in connection with such actions.