There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1181. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (03/16/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Veterans 2nd Amendment Protection Act

(Sec. 2) This bill prohibits, in any case arising out of the administration of laws and benefits by the Department of Veterans Affairs, any person who is mentally incapacitated, deemed mentally incompetent, or experiencing an extended loss of consciousness from being considered adjudicated as a mental defective for purposes of the right to receive or transport firearms without the order or finding of a judicial authority of competent jurisdiction that such person is a danger to himself or herself or others.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/16/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 240 - 175 (Roll no. 169).(text: CR H2102-2103)
03/10/2017 Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-33.
02/16/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
03/22/2017 Senate Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 21.
03/21/2017 Senate Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
03/16/2017-6:06pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/16/2017-6:06pm House On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 240 - 175 (Roll no. 169). (text: CR H2102-2103)
03/16/2017-5:59pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2135-2136)
03/16/2017-3:17pm House POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 1181, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Roe (TN) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage of H.R. 1181 until a time to be announced.
03/16/2017-3:16pm House The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
03/16/2017-2:16pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1181.
03/16/2017-2:15pm House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 198. (consideration: CR H2102-2114)
03/10/2017 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 15.
03/10/2017 House Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-33.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs
02/16/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
02/16/2017 House Introduced in House

Titles (4)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House:

Veterans 2nd Amendment Protection Act

Short Titles as Reported to House:

Veterans 2nd Amendment Protection Act

Short Titles as Introduced:

Veterans 2nd Amendment Protection Act

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To amend title 38, United States Code, to clarify the conditions under which certain persons may be treated as adjudicated mentally incompetent for certain purposes.


Subjects (5)

  • Firearms and explosives
  • Licensing and registrations
  • Mental health
  • Veterans' medical care

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 02/16/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 03/08/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 03/09/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/09/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/16/2017 Referred to
03/10/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-33

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.