There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Adam Walsh Reauthorization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Adam Walsh Reauthorization Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize certain programs established by the Adam Walsh Child Protection and Safety Act of 2006, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/22/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
05/22/2017 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-142.
02/16/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
05/23/2017 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
05/22/2017-4:21pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/22/2017-4:21pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4396-4397)
05/22/2017-4:04pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1188.
05/22/2017-4:04pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4396-4399)
05/22/2017-4:04pm House Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/22/2017 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 91.
05/22/2017 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-142.
Action By: House Judiciary
03/22/2017 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary
03/22/2017 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Judiciary
03/06/2017 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: House Judiciary
02/16/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
02/16/2017 House Introduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/16/2017 Referred to
03/22/2017 Markup by
05/22/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-142
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations03/06/2017 Referred to
Senate Judiciary05/23/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

As of 08/20/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1188 - Adam Walsh Reauthorization Act of 2017.

Subjects (20)

  • Civil actions and liability
  • Congressional oversight
  • Correctional facilities and imprisonment
  • Crime victims
  • Crimes against children
  • Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
  • Criminal justice information and records
  • Domestic violence and child abuse
  • Human trafficking
  • Indian social and development programs
  • Internet and video services
  • Juvenile crime and gang violence
  • Law enforcement administration and funding
  • Law enforcement officers
  • Licensing and registrations
  • Mental health
  • Pornography
  • Sex offenses
  • Youth employment and child labor

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1188. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/16/2017)

Adam Walsh Reauthorization Act of 2017

This bill amends the Sex Offender Registration and Notification Act to:

  • reauthorize through FY2022 the Sex Offender Management Assistance program;
  • reauthorize through FY2022 the activities of the U.S. Marshals Service to locate and apprehend sex offenders who violate sex offender registration requirements;
  • reduce from 25 years to 15 years the required registration period for certain juvenile delinquent sex offenders who maintain a clean record;
  • allow a state, Indian tribe, or territory to exempt from disclosure on a public website information about juvenile delinquent sex offenders;
  • specify how to calculate the allocation of Byrne Memorial Justice Assistance Grant (JAG) program funds for local governments after a state's JAG funds are reduced for failure to comply with sex offender registration and notification standards; and
  • establish an alternative method for complying with the in-person verification requirement.

It amends the Adam Walsh Child Protection and Safety Act of 2006 to require the Department of Justice to include additional data in its annual report on the enforcement of sex offender registration requirements.

The bill amends the federal criminal code to:

  • modify the duties of probation and pretrial services officers to include, when directed by a court, supervision of a sex offender conditionally released from civil commitment subject to court-ordered compliance with a prescribed regimen of medical, psychiatric, or psychological treatment; and
  • extend the statute of limitations for a minor victim of a federal sex offense to file a civil action to 10 years (currently 3 years) from the date such individual reaches age 18.