There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Adam Walsh Reauthorization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Adam Walsh Reauthorization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Adam Walsh Reauthorization Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize certain programs established by the Adam Walsh Child Protection and Safety Act of 2006, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
05/22/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4396-4397)
05/22/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-142.
02/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/23/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
05/22/2017-4:21pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/22/2017-4:21pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4396-4397)
05/22/2017-4:04pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1188.
05/22/2017-4:04pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4396-4399)
05/22/2017-4:04pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/22/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 91.
05/22/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-142.
03/22/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/22/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/06/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/16/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
02/16/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/16/2017 Referred to
03/22/2017 Markup by
05/22/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-142
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations03/06/2017 Referred to
Senate Judiciary05/23/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1188.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1188. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/22/2017)

Adam Walsh Reauthorization Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Sex Offender Registration and Notification Act to reauthorize through FY2022 the Sex Offender Management Assistance program.

(Sec. 3) The bill reauthorizes through FY2022 the activities of the U.S. Marshals Service to locate and apprehend sex offenders who violate sex offender registration requirements.

(Sec. 4) It reduces from 25 years to 15 years the required registration period for certain juvenile delinquent sex offenders who maintain a clean record.

(Sec. 5) It allows a state, Indian tribe, or territory to exempt from disclosure on a public website information about juvenile delinquent sex offenders.

(Sec. 6) The bill specifies how to calculate the allocation of Byrne Memorial Justice Assistance Grant (JAG) program funds for local governments after a state's JAG funds are reduced for failure to comply with sex offender registration and notification standards.

(Sec. 7) It amends the Adam Walsh Child Protection and Safety Act of 2006 to require the Department of Justice (DOJ) to include additional data in its annual report on the enforcement of sex offender registration requirements.

(Sec. 8) The bill amends the federal criminal code to broaden the duties of probation and pretrial services officers to include, when directed by a court, supervision of a sex offender conditionally released from civil commitment subject to court-ordered compliance with a prescribed regimen of medical, psychiatric, or psychological treatment.

(Sec. 9) It extends the statute of limitations for a minor victim of a federal sex offense to file a civil action to 10 years (currently, 3 years) from the date such individual reaches age 18.

(Sec. 10) It authorizes DOJ to provide technical assistance to tribal governments to promote access to federal criminal information databases. DOJ's Working Capital Fund may be reimbursed by federally recognized tribes for such technical assistance.

(Sec. 11) The bill allows a state, Indian tribe, or territory to establish an alternative method for a registered sex offender to comply with the in-person verification requirement. DOJ must approve an alternative verification method before it is implemented.

(Sec. 12) It limits the aggravated sex abuse offenses that trigger sex offender registration requirements for a juvenile at least 14 years old who is adjudicated delinquent for a comparable or more severe sex offense.

(Sec. 13) The National Institute of Justice must report to Congress on the public safety impact, recidivism, and collateral consequences of long-term registration of juvenile sex offenders.