There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Reducing Barriers for Veterans Education Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to include the cost of applying to an institution of higher learning as part of the benefits provided under the Post-9/11 Educational Assistance Program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/21/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
04/11/2018Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
04/11/2018Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
03/20/2018Committee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/06/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/21/2017Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/21/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (76)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1]* 02/21/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 02/21/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 02/21/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 02/21/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/27/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/27/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/27/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 02/27/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/27/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 02/27/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/27/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/27/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/27/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 03/07/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 03/07/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/07/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/08/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/08/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 03/13/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/13/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 03/13/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 03/13/2017
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/13/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/20/2017
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/20/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/21/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/27/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 03/29/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/03/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 04/06/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/12/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/27/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/01/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 11/08/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/03/2018
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/19/2018
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 03/20/2018
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/29/2018
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/02/2018
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 04/02/2018
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 04/11/2018
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 04/11/2018
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/11/2018
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/13/2018
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 04/13/2018
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/17/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/21/2017 Referred to
03/20/2018 Hearings by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity03/06/2017 Referred to
04/11/2018 Markup by
04/11/2018 Reported by

As of 04/20/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1206 - Reducing Barriers for Veterans Education Act of 2017.


Subjects (4)

  • Higher education
  • Student aid and college costs
  • Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1206. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/21/2017)

Reducing Barriers for Veterans Education Act of 2017

This bill makes an individual who is eligible for educational assistance under the Post-9/11 Educational Assistance program eligible for assistance with the fees for applying to institutions of higher education (IHEs).

The amount of such assistance payable to an individual shall be the lesser of: (1) the total application fees charged to the individual by the IHEs, or (2) $750.