Text: H.R.1214 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (03/28/2017)


115th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 1214


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

March 28, 2017

Received; read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs


AN ACT

To require the Administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency to conduct a program to use simplified procedures to issue public assistance for certain projects under the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Disaster Simplified Assistance Value Enhancement Act” or the “Disaster SAVE Act”.

SEC. 2. Simplified procedure program.

(a) Threshold.—The Administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency shall immediately establish the threshold for eligibility pursuant to section 422(b)(2) of the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act (42 U.S.C. 5189(b)(2)) at $500,000.

(b) Report.—Not later than May 1, 2021, the Administrator shall submit to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure of the House of Representatives and the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs of the Senate a report containing the results of a comprehensive review of the program conducted under section 422 of the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act (42 U.S.C. 5189), as modified by this section, to include an assessment of cost-effectiveness, speed of recovery, capacity of the grantees, past performance, and accountability measures.

(c) Sunset.—This Act shall expire on September 30, 2021.

Passed the House of Representatives March 27, 2017.

    Attest: karen l. haas,   
    Clerk

Share This