There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1219. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (04/06/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Supporting America's Innovators Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Investment Company Act of 1940 to exempt from the definition of an "investment company," for purposes of specified limitations applicable to such a company under the Act, a qualifying venture capital fund that has no more than 250 investors. Specifically, the bill applies to a venture capital fund that has less than $10 million in aggregate capital contributions and uncalled committed capital.

Under current law, a venture capital fund is considered to be an investment company if it has more than 100 investors.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
04/06/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 417 - 3 (Roll no. 221).(text: CR H2759)
03/29/2017 Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-70.
02/27/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
04/06/2017 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
04/06/2017-10:32am House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/06/2017-10:32am House On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 417 - 3 (Roll no. 221). (text: CR H2759)
04/06/2017-10:06am House The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
04/06/2017-9:16am House DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1219.
04/06/2017-9:15am House Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1219 with 1 hour of general debate. The resolution provides for one motion to recommit; and providing for proceedings during the period from April 7, 2017 through April 24, 2017
04/06/2017-9:15am House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 242. (consideration: CR H2759-2767)
04/05/2017-2:06pm House Rule H. Res. 242 passed House.
04/03/2017-7:10pm House Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 242 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1219 with 1 hour of general debate. The resolution provides for one motion to recommit; and providing for proceedings during the period from April 7, 2017 through April 24, 2017
03/29/2017 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 41.
03/29/2017 House Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-70.
Action By: House Financial Services
03/09/2017 House Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 54 - 2.
Action By: House Financial Services
03/09/2017 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. Markup report CQ
Action By: House Financial Services
02/27/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
02/27/2017 House Introduced in House

Titles (4)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House:

Supporting America's Innovators Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House:

Supporting America's Innovators Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced:

Supporting America's Innovators Act of 2017

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To amend the Investment Company Act of 1940 to expand the investor limitation for qualifying venture capital funds under an exemption from the definition of an investment company.


Subjects (3)

  • Business investment and capital
  • Financial services and investments

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 02/27/2017
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9] 03/08/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 03/16/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 03/20/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services02/27/2017 Referred to
03/09/2017 Markup by
03/29/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-70
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs04/06/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.