There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the appointment of members of the Board of Directors of the Office of Compliance to replace members whose terms expire during 2017, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
04/03/2017Became Public Law No: 115-19. (TXT | PDF)
04/03/2017Signed by President.
03/23/2017Presented to President.
03/21/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1897)
03/15/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
03/15/2017Committee on House Administration discharged.(consideration: CR H2071; text: CR H2071)
02/27/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
04/03/2017Became Public Law No: 115-19. (TXT | PDF)
04/03/2017Signed by President.
03/23/2017HousePresented to President.
03/22/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/21/2017SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1897)
03/15/2017-7:51pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/15/2017-7:51pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
03/15/2017-7:51pmHouseH.Amdt.80 On agreeing to the Harper amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
03/15/2017-7:50pmHouseH.Amdt.80 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Harper. (consideration: CR H2071; text: CR H2071)
03/15/2017HouseCommittee on House Administration discharged. (consideration: CR H2071; text: CR H2071)
03/15/2017-7:50pmHouseMr. Harper asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
02/27/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
02/27/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/27/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration02/27/2017 Referred to
03/15/2017 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.1228.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.1228. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-19 (04/03/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on March 15, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) This bill provides that of the three members appointed to the Board of Directors of the Office of Compliance (OOC) to replace the three members whose terms expire in March 2017, one shall have a three-year term and two shall have a four-year term. (The OOC was established by the Congressional Accountability Act of 1995 to administer and enforce that Act and to assist Members of Congress in understanding their rights and responsibilities under workplace and accessibility laws.)

The board members appointed to replace the two members whose terms expire in May 2017 shall each have a five-year term.

This bill allows a board member whose term expires in: (1) March 2017 to be reappointed to serve one additional three or four-year term, and (2) May 2017 to be reappointed to serve an additional five-year term. Such board members may not be reappointed to any additional terms after their additional term expires.

The bill amends the Congressional Accountability Act of 1995 to: (1) permit a board member to serve after his or her term has expired until a successor has taken office; and (2) authorize the Speaker of the House of Representatives, the Majority Leader of the Senate, and the Minority Leaders of the House and Senate to take such steps as they consider appropriate to ensure the timely appointment of board members consistent with such Act's requirements.