There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Securing our Agriculture and Food Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Securing our Agriculture and Food Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Securing our Agriculture and Food Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Securing our Agriculture and Food Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Securing our Agriculture and Food Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to make the Assistant Secretary of Homeland Security for Health Affairs responsible for coordinating the efforts of the Department of Homeland Security related to food, agriculture, and veterinary defense against terrorism, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (11)

Date
06/30/2017Became Public Law No: 115-43. (TXT | PDF)
06/30/2017Signed by President.
06/27/2017Presented to President.
06/20/2017Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to without objection.(text as House agreed to Senate amendments: CR H4974-4975)
05/24/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
05/24/2017Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/22/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 6 (Roll no. 187).(text: CR H2304-2305)
03/16/2017Committee on Agriculture discharged.
03/16/2017Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
03/16/2017Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-42, Part I.
02/28/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (31)

Date Chamber
06/30/2017Became Public Law No: 115-43. (TXT | PDF)
06/30/2017Signed by President.
06/27/2017HousePresented to President.
06/20/2017-6:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/20/2017-6:11pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendments: CR H4974-4975)
06/20/2017-6:11pmHouseMr. Katko asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H4974-4975)
05/25/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/24/2017SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
05/24/2017SenateS.Amdt.217 Amendment SA 217 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
05/24/2017SenateS.Amdt.217 Amendment SA 217 proposed by Senator Sullivan for Senator Roberts. (consideration: CR S3151-3152; text: CR S3151-3152) To preserve the authority of the Secretaries of Agriculture and Health and Human Services and make a technical correction.
05/24/2017SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3151-3152)
05/24/2017SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/23/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
03/22/2017-3:48pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/22/2017-3:48pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 6 (Roll no. 187). (text: CR H2304-2305)
03/22/2017-3:40pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2330-2331)
03/22/2017-12:50pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/22/2017-12:40pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1238.
03/22/2017-12:40pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2304-2307)
03/22/2017-12:39pmHouseMr. Donovan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/16/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 22.
03/16/2017HouseCommittee on Agriculture discharged.
03/16/2017HouseCommittee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
03/16/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-42, Part I.
03/08/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
03/08/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/03/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/28/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
02/28/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
02/28/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
02/28/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11]* 02/28/2017

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security02/28/2017 Referred to
03/08/2017 Markup by
03/16/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-42
House Energy and Commerce02/28/2017 Referred to
03/16/2017 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/03/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture02/28/2017 Referred to
03/16/2017 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs03/23/2017 Referred to
05/24/2017 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.1238. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-43 (06/30/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on May 24, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Securing our Agriculture and Food Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to direct the Assistant Secretary for Health Affairs for the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to carry out a program to coordinate DHS efforts related to defending the food, agriculture, and veterinary systems of the United States against terrorism and other high-consequence events that pose a high risk to homeland security.

Such program shall:

  • provide oversight and management of DHS's responsibilities pursuant to Homeland Security Presidential Directive 9 - Defense of United States Agriculture and Food;
  • provide oversight and integration of DHS activities related to veterinary public health, food defense, and agricultural security;
  • lead DHS policy initiatives related to food, animal, and agricultural incidents and to overall domestic preparedness for, and collective response to, agricultural terrorism;
  • coordinate with other DHS components on activities related to food and agriculture security and screening procedures for domestic and imported products; and
  • coordinate with appropriate federal departments and agencies.