There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

400 Years of African-American History Commission Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

400 Years of African-American History Commission Act

Short Titles as Introduced

400 Years of African-American History Commission Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

400 Years of African-American History Commission Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the 400 Years of African-American History Commission, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
01/08/2018Became Public Law No: 115-102. (TXT | PDF)
01/08/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2017Presented to President.
12/21/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S8267-8269)
05/01/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2985-2986)
05/01/2017Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-105.
02/28/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
01/08/2018Became Public Law No: 115-102. (TXT | PDF)
01/08/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2017HousePresented to President.
12/22/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/21/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S8267-8269)
05/02/2017SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
05/01/2017-5:33pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/01/2017-5:33pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2985-2986)
05/01/2017-5:24pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1242.
05/01/2017-5:24pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2985-2987)
05/01/2017-5:24pmHouseMr. Comer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/01/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 62.
05/01/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-105.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/28/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/28/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
02/28/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
02/28/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Scott [R-VA-2]* 02/28/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 02/28/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/01/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/01/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/07/2017
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/07/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/07/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/07/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/16/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/17/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 03/27/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/27/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 03/27/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/29/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 03/29/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/29/2017
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/08/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/01/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/01/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 05/01/2017
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 05/01/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/01/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/01/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/01/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 05/01/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform02/28/2017 Referred to
03/28/2017 Markup by
05/01/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-105

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.1242. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-102 (01/08/2018)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on May 1, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

400 Years of African-American History Commission Act

(Sec. 3) This bill establishes the 400 Years of African-American History Commission to develop and carry out activities throughout the United States to commemorate the 400th anniversary of the arrival of Africans in the English colonies at Point Comfort, Virginia, in 1619.

The commission must:

  • plan programs to acknowledge the impact that slavery and laws that enforced racial discrimination had on the United States;
  • encourage civic, patriotic, historical, educational, artistic, religious, and economic organizations to organize and participate in anniversary activities;
  • assist states, localities, and nonprofit organizations to further the commemoration; and
  • coordinate for the public scholarly research on the arrival of Africans in the United States and their contributions to this country.

(Sec. 5) The commission may provide: (1) grants to communities and nonprofit organizations for the development of programs; (2) grants to research and scholarly organizations to research, publish, or distribute information relating to the arrival of Africans in the United States; and (3) technical assistance to states, localities, and nonprofit organizations to further the commemoration.

(Sec. 7) The commission must prepare a strategic plan and submit a final report to Congress that contains a summary of its activities, an accounting of its received and expended funds, and its recommendations.

(Sec. 8) The commission shall terminate on July 1, 2020.

(Sec. 9) All expenditures of the commission shall be made solely from donated funds.