There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/20/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 0 (Roll no. 174).(text of measure as passed: CR H2216-2217)
03/20/2017 Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-46.
02/28/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
03/21/2017 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
03/20/2017-7:07pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/20/2017-7:07pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 0 (Roll no. 174). (text of measure as passed: CR H2216-2217)
03/20/2017-7:01pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2223-2224)
03/20/2017-4:29pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/20/2017-4:23pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1249.
03/20/2017-4:23pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2216-2219)
03/20/2017-4:23pm House Mr. Fitzpatrick moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/20/2017 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 26.
03/20/2017 House Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-46.
Action By: House Homeland Security
03/08/2017 House Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Homeland Security
03/08/2017 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. Markup report CQ
Action By: House Homeland Security
02/28/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
02/28/2017 House Introduced in House

Titles (3)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House:

DHS Multiyear Acquisition Strategy Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced:

DHS Multiyear Acquisition Strategy Act of 2017

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require a multiyear acquisition strategy of the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.


Subjects (14)

  • Accounting and auditing
  • Advanced technology and technological innovations
  • Congressional oversight
  • Department of Homeland Security
  • Employee performance
  • Fraud offenses and financial crimes
  • Government buildings, facilities, and property
  • Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
  • Government studies and investigations
  • Minority and disadvantaged businesses
  • Public contracts and procurement
  • Research and development
  • Small business

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/28/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security02/28/2017 Referred to
03/08/2017 Markup by
03/20/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-46
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs03/21/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

As of 04/30/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1249 - DHS Multiyear Acquisition Strategy Act of 2017.