There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Closing the Meal Gap Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Food and Nutrition Act of 2008 to require that supplemental nutrition assistance program benefits be calculated with reference to the cost of the low-cost food plan as determined by the Secretary of Agriculture, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/01/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/23/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
03/01/2017Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/01/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (117)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/01/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 03/01/2017
Del. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/01/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 03/01/2017
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 03/02/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/02/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/08/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 03/08/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/08/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 03/08/2017
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 03/08/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/08/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/25/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 04/25/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 04/25/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/25/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 04/28/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/12/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/26/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/29/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/12/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/14/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 07/26/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 09/07/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/18/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/27/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 09/27/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/27/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/02/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/02/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 10/04/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/06/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/06/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 10/06/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/06/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 10/06/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/06/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 10/06/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 10/06/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/06/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 10/06/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 10/06/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 10/06/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 10/10/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 10/16/2017
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 10/16/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/16/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 10/19/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/25/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/06/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/07/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/17/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/17/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/06/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/06/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 12/06/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 12/21/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 01/05/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 01/05/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 01/16/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 02/07/2018
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/14/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/27/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 03/05/2018
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/05/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/05/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 03/06/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 03/06/2018
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 03/06/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/06/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/06/2018
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/09/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 03/09/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/14/2018
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 03/14/2018
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 03/14/2018
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/14/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 03/21/2018
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/26/2018
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 03/26/2018
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 04/10/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/10/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 04/17/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/17/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 04/23/2018
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 05/03/2018
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 05/10/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/10/2018
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/24/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/01/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 06/12/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Agriculture03/01/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Nutrition03/23/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1276. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/01/2017)

Closing the Meal Gap Act of 2017

This bill amends the Food and Nutrition Act of 2008 to revise the requirements for calculating Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP, formerly known as the food stamp program) benefits.

The bill increases the minimum SNAP benefit and requires benefits to be calculated using a low-cost food plan. The Department of Agriculture (USDA) must determine the requirements for the low-cost food plan, which is the diet required to feed a family of four, consisting of:

  • a man and a woman 19-50 years of age,
  • a child 6-8 years of age, and
  • a child 9-11 years of age.

USDA must make adjustments to the plan to account for household size, changes in the cost of the diet, and the costs of food in specified areas.

The bill revises the amounts authorized for nutrition assistance block grants for Puerto Rico and American Samoa and requires the amounts to be modified based on adjustments to the low-cost food plan.

The bill modifies the requirements for calculating household income to determine SNAP eligibility by: (1) authorizing a standard medical expense deduction for households containing an elderly or disabled member, and (2) eliminating the cap on the deduction for excess shelter expenses.

The bill exempts from SNAP work requirements able-bodied adults without dependents who are not offered a position in a SNAP Employment and Training Program.