There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Helping Veterans Exposed to Burn Pits Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to establish within the Department of Veterans Affairs a center of excellence in the prevention, diagnosis, mitigation, treatment, and rehabilitation of health conditions relating to exposure to burn pits.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/01/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
03/27/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/23/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
03/01/2017Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/01/2017Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/01/2017Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/01/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 03/01/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6]* 03/01/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/24/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 03/29/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/03/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/03/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 04/04/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/04/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 04/04/2017
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/04/2017
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 04/06/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/24/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/02/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/02/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/11/2017
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 05/18/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 05/24/2017
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 06/02/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 06/12/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/20/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/13/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/26/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/26/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/27/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/03/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/03/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/04/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/10/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/24/2017
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 10/26/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 10/31/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 11/06/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/29/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/22/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/01/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 03/14/2018
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 03/19/2018
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/09/2018
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 05/16/2018
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/06/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/13/2018
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 08/14/2018
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-18] 09/06/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/01/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health03/27/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services03/01/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel03/23/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1279. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/01/2017)

Helping Veterans Exposed to Burn Pits Act

This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to establish a center of excellence in the prevention, diagnosis, mitigation, treatment, and rehabilitation of health conditions relating to exposure to burn pits and other environmental exposures in Afghanistan or Iraq.

The VA shall, in selecting the center's site, consider entities that:

  • are equipped with the specialized equipment needed to study, diagnose, and treat health conditions relating to such exposure;
  • have a track record of publishing information on post-deployment health exposures among veterans who served in support of Operation Iraqi Freedom and Operation Enduring Freedom;
  • have access to animal models and in vitro models of dust immunology and lung injury consistent with the injuries of members of the Armed Forces who served in support of such operations; and
  • have expertise in allergy, immunology, and pulmonary diseases.

The VA shall ensure that the center collaborates with the Department of Defense (DOD), institutions of higher education, and other appropriate public and private entities to:

  • provide for dissemination within the VA of best practices for the treatment of such conditions and the training of health professionals,
  • provide guidance for the VA and DOD health systems in determining the personnel required to provide quality health care for members of the Armed Forces and veterans with such conditions,
  • establish, and oversee a program to train VA and DOD health professionals in the treatment of such conditions,
  • facilitate advancements in the study of the short-term and long-term effects of such exposure,
  • conduct basic science and translational research on such conditions for the purposes of understanding the etiology of such conditions and developing preventive interventions and new treatments, and
  • provide medical treatment to veterans diagnosed with medical conditions specific to exposure to burn pits and other environmental exposures.

The center shall have access to and make use of the data accumulated by the burn pits registry.