There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

DHS Acquisition Review Board Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

DHS Acquisition Review Board Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

DHS Acquisition Review Board Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish the Acquisition Review Board in the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish Acquisition Review Boards in the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/21/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5020-5021)
03/23/2017 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-57.
03/01/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
06/22/2017 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
06/21/2017-3:03pm House The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
06/21/2017-3:03pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/21/2017-3:03pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5020-5021)
06/21/2017-2:52pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1282.
06/21/2017-2:52pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5020-5022)
06/21/2017-2:52pm House Mr. Garrett moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/23/2017 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 32.
03/23/2017 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-57.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/08/2017 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/01/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
03/01/2017 House Introduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/01/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security03/01/2017 Referred to
03/23/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-57
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/22/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (7)

  • Advisory bodies
  • Congressional oversight
  • Department of Homeland Security
  • Executive agency funding and structure
  • Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
  • Public contracts and procurement

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1282. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/21/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on March 23, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

DHS Acquisition Review Board Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security of 2002 to require the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to establish an Acquisition Review Board to strengthen accountability and uniformity within the DHS acquisition review process, review major acquisition programs (programs estimated to require a total expenditure of at least $300 million over their life cycle costs), and review the use of best practices.

The board shall convene at DHS's discretion and whenever: (1) a major acquisition program requires authorization to proceed from one acquisition decision event to another, is in breach of its approved requirements, or requires additional review; or (2) a non-major acquisition program requires review.

The board's responsibilities are to:

  • determine whether a proposed acquisition has met the requirements of key phases of the acquisition life cycle framework and is able to proceed to the next phase and eventual full production and deployment;
  • oversee whether a proposed acquisition's business strategy, resources, management, and accountability is executable and aligned to strategic initiatives;
  • support the acquisition decision authority in determining the appropriate direction at key acquisition decision events;
  • conduct systematic reviews to ensure that acquisitions are progressing in compliance with the approved documents for their current acquisition phases;
  • review the acquisition documents of each major acquisition program to ensure the reliability of underlying data; and
  • ensure that practices are implemented to require consideration of tradeoffs among cost, schedule, and performance objectives as part of the process for developing requirements for major acquisition programs prior to initiating the second acquisition decision event.

If the person exercising acquisition decision authority over a major acquisition program approves such program to proceed into the planning phase before such program has a DHS-approved acquisition program baseline, DHS shall: (1) create and approve a baseline report regarding such approval; (2) notify Congress within 7 days after an acquisition decision memorandum is signed; and (3) within 60 days after such signing, report on the rationale for such decision and a plan of action to require an acquisition program baseline for such program.

DHS shall report annually to specified congressional committees through FY2022 on the board's activities, including information on:

  • any acquisition decision memoranda for each meeting of the board,
  • results of the systematic reviews,
  • results of acquisition document reviews, and
  • activities to ensure that practices are adopted and implemented throughout DHS regarding such tradeoffs.