There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 5, United States Code, to require that the Office of Personnel Management submit an annual report to Congress relating to the use of official time by Federal employees.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
10/05/2017 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-167.
05/24/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
05/11/2017 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-118.
03/01/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
10/05/2017 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 236.
10/05/2017 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-167.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
07/26/2017 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
05/25/2017 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
05/24/2017-2:40pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/24/2017-2:40pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4528-4529)
05/24/2017-2:02pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1293.
05/24/2017-2:02pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4528-4533)
05/24/2017-2:02pm House Mr. Ross moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/11/2017 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 71.
05/11/2017 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-118.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/08/2017 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/08/2017 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/01/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
03/01/2017 House Introduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform03/01/2017 Referred to
03/08/2017 Markup by
05/11/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-118
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs05/25/2017 Referred to
07/26/2017 Markup by
10/05/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-167

Related Bills (0)

As of 11/17/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1293 - To amend title 5, United States Code, to require that the Office of Personnel Management submit an annual report to Congress relating to the use of official time by Federal employees..

Subjects (5)

  • Congressional oversight
  • Employee leave
  • Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
  • Labor-management relations

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1293. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/24/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on May 11, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) This bill requires the Office of Personnel Management to submit an annual report to Congress on the use of official time by federal employees. The report must include at a minimum:

    • the total amount of official time granted to employees,
    • the average amount of official time expended per bargaining unit employee,
    • the specific types of activities or purposes for which office time was granted and the impact on agency operations,
    • the total number of employees to whom official time was granted and the number engaged exclusively in activities involving the use of official time,
    • the total amount of compensation (including fringe benefits) afforded to employees granted official time,
    • the total amount of office time spent by employees representing federal employees who are not union members, and
    • a description of any room or space designated at the agency where official time will be conducted.

The bill defines "official time" as any period of time granted to a federal employee to perform representational or consultative functions and during which the employee would otherwise be in a duty status.