There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Berta Caceres Human Rights in Honduras Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To suspend United States security assistance with Honduras until such time as human rights violations by Honduran security forces cease and their perpetrators are brought to justice.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/02/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/02/2017Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2017Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2017Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (70)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/02/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 03/02/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/06/2017
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 03/06/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 03/09/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/09/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 03/15/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/15/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/15/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/17/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/20/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/20/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/20/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/20/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/20/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/20/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 03/21/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/21/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/23/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 03/24/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/29/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/03/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 04/12/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 04/12/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/20/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/20/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/25/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/25/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 04/28/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/28/2017
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/02/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/02/2017
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 05/22/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/06/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/06/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/06/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/12/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 08/25/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 08/25/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 09/01/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/01/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 09/25/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/25/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 09/25/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 10/03/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 11/30/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/18/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 12/20/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs03/02/2017 Referred to
House Financial Services03/02/2017 Referred to

As of 10/20/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1299 - Berta Caceres Human Rights in Honduras Act.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1299. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/02/2017)

Berta Caceres Human Rights in Honduras Act

This bill prohibits funds from being made available to Honduras for the police or military (including for equipment and training), and directs the Department of the Treasury to instruct U.S. representatives at multilateral development banks to vote against any loans for the police or military of Honduras, until the Department of States certifies that the government of Honduras has:

  • prosecuted members of the military and police for human rights violations and ensured that such violations have ceased;
  • established the rule of law and guaranteed a judicial system capable of bringing to justice members of the police and military who have committed human rights abuses;
  • established that it protects the rights of trade unionists, journalists, human rights defenders, government critics, and civil society activists to operate without interference;
  • withdrawn the military from domestic policing; and
  • brought to trial and obtained verdicts against those who ordered and carried out the attack on Felix Molina and the killings of Berta Caceres, Joel Palacios Lino, Elvis Armando Garcia, and over 100 small-farmer activists in the Aguan Valley.