There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Continuing Appropriations Amendments Act, 2018

Other Short Titles

Continuing Appropriations Amendments Act, 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Department of Defense Appropriations Act, 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Defense Appropriations Act, 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Continuing Appropriations Amendments Act, 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making appropriations for the Department of Defense for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2017, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
02/09/2018Became Public Law No: 115-124. (TXT | PDF)
02/09/2018Signed by President.
02/09/2018Presented to President.
02/09/2018Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text of Senate amendment: CR 2/8/2018 H1071-1072)
02/09/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
03/08/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 371 - 48 (Roll no. 136).(text: CR H1621-1639)
03/02/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber
02/09/2018Became Public Law No: 115-124. (TXT | PDF)
02/09/2018Signed by President.
02/09/2018HousePresented to President.
02/09/2018-5:35amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/09/2018-5:35amHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text of Senate amendment: CR 2/8/2018 H1071-1072)
02/09/2018-5:35amHouseMr. Frelinghuysen asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR 2/8/2018 H1071-1072)
02/09/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/09/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
02/09/2018SenateS.Amdt.1942 Amendment SA 1942 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
02/09/2018SenateS.Amdt.1942 Amendment SA 1942 proposed by Senator McConnell. (consideration: CR S853; text: CR S853) In the nature of a substitute.
02/09/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S853)
04/07/2017SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 36.
04/05/2017SenateRead the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
03/09/2017SenateReceived in the Senate.
03/08/2017-5:20pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/08/2017-5:20pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 371 - 48 (Roll no. 136). (text: CR H1621-1639)
03/08/2017-4:57pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1941-1942)
03/08/2017-4:25pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 10 of Rule 20, the yeas and nays are ordered on the question of passage of H.R. 1301. The Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage until later in the legislative day.
03/08/2017-4:24pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
03/08/2017-3:35pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1301.
03/08/2017-3:34pmHousePrevious question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1301
03/08/2017-3:34pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 174. (consideration: CR H1621-1941)
03/08/2017-3:17pmHouseRule H. Res. 174 passed House.
03/07/2017-7:22pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 174 Reported to House. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1301
03/02/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/02/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/02/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations03/02/2017 Referred to
House Budget03/02/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (84)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.1301. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-124 (02/09/2018)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on February 9, 2018. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Continuing Appropriations Amendments Act, 2018

(Sec. 101) This bill amends the Continuing Appropriations Act, 2018 to: (1) compensate employees furloughed as a result of any lapse in appropriations which began on or about February 9, 2018; and (2) ratify and approve certain obligations incurred in anticipation of the appropriations and authority provided by the Continuing Appropriations Act, 2018.

(Sec. 102) The bill also specifies that the time covered by the Continuing Appropriations Act, 2018 includes the period that began on or about February 9, 2018, during which there was a lapse in appropriations.