There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Terrorist and Foreign Fighter Travel Exercise Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Terrorist and Foreign Fighter Travel Exercise Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Terrorist and Foreign Fighter Travel Exercise Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require an exercise related to terrorist and foreign fighter travel, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/24/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2303)
03/16/2017Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-40.
03/02/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
03/27/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
03/24/2017-4:30pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/24/2017-4:30pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2303)
03/24/2017-4:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2441-2442)
03/22/2017-12:39pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Ms. McSally objected to the Yea - Nay vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
03/22/2017-12:32pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1302.
03/22/2017-12:32pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2303-2304)
03/22/2017-12:31pmHouseMs. McSally moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/16/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 20.
03/16/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-40.
03/08/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
03/08/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/02/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
03/02/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security03/02/2017 Referred to
03/08/2017 Markup by
03/16/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-40
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs03/27/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure09/13/2018 Legislative interest

No related bill information was received for H.R.1302.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1302. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (03/24/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Terrorist and Foreign Fighter Travel Exercise Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to develop and conduct an exercise related to the terrorist and foreign fighter threat in order to enhance domestic preparedness for and the collective response to terrorism, promote the dissemination of homeland security information, and test the U.S. security posture.

Such exercise shall include: (1) a scenario involving persons traveling from the United States to join or provide material support or resources to a terrorist organization abroad and terrorist infiltration into the United States, including by U.S. citizens and foreign nationals; and (2) coordination with relevant federal agencies, foreign governments, and state, local, tribal, territorial, and private sector stakeholders.

DHS shall submit an after-action report, including any identified or potential vulnerabilities in U.S. defenses and requested legislative changes.

(Sec. 3) The bill amends the Post-Katrina Emergency Management Reform Act of 2006 to require the national exercise program (a program to test and evaluate the national preparedness goal, National Incident Management System, National Response Plan, and other related plans and strategies) to be designed to include exercises addressing emerging terrorist threats, such as such a scenario.