There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1304. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/02/2017)

Self-Insurance Protection Act

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act, the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 (ERISA), and the Internal Revenue Code to exclude from the definition of "health insurance coverage" a stop-loss policy obtained by a self-insured health plan or a sponsor of a self-insured group health plan to reimburse the plan or sponsor for losses incurred in providing health benefits to plan participants in excess of a level set forth in the stop-loss policy.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
04/05/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 400 - 16 (Roll no. 220).(text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H2726-2727)
03/20/2017 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 115-53, Part I.
03/02/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
04/06/2017 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
04/05/2017-3:59pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/05/2017-3:58pm House On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 400 - 16 (Roll no. 220). (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H2726-2727)
04/05/2017-3:46pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2731-2732)
04/05/2017-3:08pm House POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 1304, the Chair put the question on passage of H.R. 1304 and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Foxx demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage until a time to be announced.
04/05/2017-3:07pm House The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
04/05/2017-2:44pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1304.
04/05/2017-2:43pm House Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1304 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed.
04/05/2017-2:43pm House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 241. (consideration: CR H2726-2729)
04/04/2017-2:14pm House Rule H. Res. 241 passed House.
04/03/2017-6:50pm House Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 241 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1304 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed.
03/20/2017 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 115-53, Part I.
Action By: House Education and the Workforce
03/08/2017 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Education and the Workforce
03/08/2017 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. Markup report CQ
Action By: House Education and the Workforce
03/03/2017 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
03/02/2017 House Referred to House Education and the Workforce
03/02/2017 House Referred to House Ways and Means
03/02/2017 House Referred to House Energy and Commerce
03/02/2017 House Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/02/2017 House Introduced in House

Titles (4)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House:

Self-Insurance Protection Act

Short Titles as Reported to House:

Self-Insurance Protection Act

Short Titles as Introduced:

Self-Insurance Protection Act

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To amend the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974, the Public Health Service Act, and the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to exclude from the definition of health insurance coverage certain medical stop-loss insurance obtained by certain plan sponsors of group health plans.


Subjects (4)

  • Employee benefits and pensions
  • Health care costs and insurance
  • Insurance industry and regulation

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/02/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/03/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/02/2017 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce03/02/2017 Referred to
03/08/2017 Markup by
03/20/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-53
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions04/06/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (3)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.