There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Preserving Employee Wellness Programs Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Preserving Employee Wellness Programs Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To clarify rules relating to nondiscriminatory workplace wellness programs.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
12/11/2017Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
12/11/2017Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
12/11/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 115-459, Part I.
03/02/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date All Actions
12/11/2017Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 341.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/11/2017Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/11/2017Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/11/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 115-459, Part I.
03/08/2017Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 17.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
03/08/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
03/06/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/03/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/02/2017Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2017Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2017Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2017Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 03/07/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 03/07/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 03/17/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/20/2017

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and the Workforce03/02/2017 Referred to
03/08/2017 Markup by
12/11/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-459
House Energy and Commerce03/02/2017 Referred to
12/11/2017 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/03/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/02/2017 Referred to
12/11/2017 Discharged from
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health03/06/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1313.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1313. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part I (12/11/2017)

Preserving Employee Wellness Programs Act

(Sec. 3) This bill exempts workplace wellness programs from: (1) limitations under the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 on medical examinations and inquiries of employees, (2) the prohibition on collecting genetic information in connection with issuing health insurance, and (3) limitations under the Genetic Information Nondiscrimination Act of 2008 on collecting the genetic information of employees or family members of employees. This exemption applies to workplace wellness programs that comply with limits on rewards for employees participating in the program.

Workplace wellness programs may provide for more favorable treatment of individuals with adverse health factors, such as a disability.

Collection of information about a disease or disorder of a family member as part of a workplace wellness program is not an unlawful acquisition of genetic information about another family member.