There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

RFS Reform Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Clean Air Act to eliminate certain requirements under the renewable fuel program, to prohibit the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency from approving the introduction into commerce of gasoline that contains greater than 10-volume-percent ethanol, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/02/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/17/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/02/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2017Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E271)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/02/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 03/02/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/02/2017
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/10/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 03/10/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 03/17/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 03/17/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/30/2017
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/18/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 05/23/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 05/23/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/22/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/22/2017
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 08/15/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/11/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 10/26/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/02/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment03/17/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1315.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1315. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/02/2017)

RFS Reform Act of 2017

This bill amends the Clean Air Act to revise the renewable fuel standard program. Beginning in 2017, the renewable fuel that is required to be blended into gasoline must be advanced biofuel, which cannot be ethanol derived from corn starch.

This bill revises the renewable fuel standards by decreasing the total volume of renewable fuel that must be contained in gasoline sold or introduced into commerce for years 2017 through 2022.

The Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) must determine the target amount of cellulosic biofuel to be blended into transportation fuel based on the actual volume of cellulosic biofuel produced in the current year.

The EPA must reduce the required volume of renewable fuel in transportation fuel by the same volume of cellulosic biofuel in the fuel.

The EPA may not allow gasoline containing greater than 10% ethanol by volume to be introduced into commerce. Waivers that allow gasoline containing a greater percentage of ethanol are nullified.