There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Arbuckle Project Maintenance Complex and District Office Conveyance Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Arbuckle Project Maintenance Complex and District Office Conveyance Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Arbuckle Project Maintenance Complex and District Office Conveyance Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to convey certain land and appurtenances of the Arbuckle Project, Oklahoma, to the Arbuckle Master Conservancy District, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/15/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-369.
03/15/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 1 (Roll no. 159).
01/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/15/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 656.
11/15/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-369.
10/02/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/13/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
03/21/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
03/15/2017-6:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/15/2017-6:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 1 (Roll no. 159).
03/15/2017-6:32pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2066-2067)
03/15/2017-4:49pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/15/2017-4:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House resumed debate on H.R. 132.
03/15/2017-4:46pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2063)
03/08/2017-5:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 132.
03/08/2017-5:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1942-1943; text of measure as introduced: CR H1942)
03/08/2017-5:22pmHouseMr. Webster (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/10/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/03/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/03/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/03/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans02/10/2017 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/21/2017 Referred to
10/02/2018 Markup by
11/15/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-369
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power06/13/2018 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.132.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.132. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (03/15/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Arbuckle Project Maintenance Complex and District Office Conveyance Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of the Interior to convey to the Arbuckle Master Conservancy District in Murray County, Oklahoma, all right, title, and interest of the United States in and to the Maintenance Complex and District Office of the Arbuckle Project.

The bill shields the federal government from being held liable by any court for damages arising out of any act, omission, or occurrence related to the complex and office, except for damages caused by acts of negligence by the government or government employees or agents prior to its conveyance.

After such conveyance: (1) the complex and office shall not be considered to be a part of a federal reclamation project; and (2) such district shall not be eligible to receive any benefits with respect to any facility comprising such complex and office, except benefits that would be available to a similarly situated person with respect to such a facility that is not part of a federal reclamation project.

If the conveyance has not been completed within 12 months, Interior shall submit to Congress an explanation and the date by which the conveyance will be completed.