There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To increase, effective as of December 1, 2017, the rates of compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for the survivors of certain disabled veterans, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To increase, effective as of December 1, 2017, the rates of compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for the survivors of certain disabled veterans, to amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the United States Court of Appeals for Veterans Claims, to improve the processing of claims by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
11/02/2017Became Public Law No: 115-75. (TXT | PDF)
11/02/2017Signed by President.
11/02/2017Presented to President.
10/25/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/25/2017Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6820)
05/23/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4476)
05/19/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-134.
03/02/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/02/2017Became Public Law No: 115-75. (TXT | PDF)
11/02/2017Signed by President.
11/02/2017HousePresented to President.
10/26/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/25/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/25/2017SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6820)
05/24/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/23/2017-4:06pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
05/23/2017-4:06pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/23/2017-4:06pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4476)
05/23/2017-3:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1329.
05/23/2017-3:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4476-4477)
05/23/2017-3:55pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/19/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 83.
05/19/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-134.
05/17/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/17/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/27/2017HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
04/27/2017HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
04/05/2017HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
03/09/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/02/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
03/02/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (12)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/02/2017 Referred to
05/17/2017 Markup by
05/19/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-134
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs03/09/2017 Referred to
04/05/2017 Hearings by
04/27/2017 Markup by
04/27/2017 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/24/2017 Referred to
10/25/2017 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.1329. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-75 (11/02/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on May 19, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to increase, as of December 1, 2017, the rates of veterans' wartime disability compensation, additional compensation for dependents, the clothing allowance for certain disabled veterans, and dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and children.

Each such increase shall be the same percentage as the increase in benefits provided under title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act, on the same effective date.

The VA may adjust administratively, consistent with such increases, the rates of disability compensation payable to persons entitled to veterans benefits under public laws administered by the VA on December 31, 1958, who have not received benefits under provisions governing veterans compensation for service-connected disability or death.

(Sec. 3) The VA shall publish such increased rates in the Federal Register not later than the date on which certain social security increases are required to be published in FY2018.