There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

ALERTED Act of 2017
Assuring Law Enforcement Requests Are Timely Evaluated by the Department of Homeland Security Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to require U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, upon the request of a law enforcement official, to make a prompt determination of whether to issue a detainer in the case of an alien arrested for a violation of Federal, State, or local law.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/02/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/17/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/02/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 03/02/2017
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/02/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 03/02/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 03/24/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/24/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 03/28/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/29/2017
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/30/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 04/03/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 04/03/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/26/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/28/2017
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 05/02/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/03/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/03/2017
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/16/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 05/16/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 05/17/2017
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 05/17/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/06/2017
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 06/12/2017
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/20/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/17/2017
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/07/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary03/02/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security03/17/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1334.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1334. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/02/2017)

Assuring Law Enforcement Requests Are Timely Evaluated by the Department of Homeland Security Act of 2017 or the ALERTED Act of 2017

This bill amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to direct U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, upon request by a federal, state, or local law enforcement official, to determine whether to issue a detainer to detain an alien arrested by such official for a violation of any law, not just one relating to controlled substances.