There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1343. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (03/29/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Encouraging Employee Ownership Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill  requires the Securities and Exchange Commission to increase, from $5 million to $10 million, the 12-month sales threshold beyond which an issuer is required to provide investors with additional disclosures related to compensatory benefit plans.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
04/04/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 331 - 87 (Roll no. 216).(text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H2667)
03/29/2017 Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-71.
03/02/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
04/05/2017 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
04/04/2017-4:58pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/04/2017-4:58pm House On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 331 - 87 (Roll no. 216). (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H2667)
04/04/2017-4:45pm House On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 185 - 228 (Roll no. 215).
04/04/2017-4:20pm House The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
04/04/2017-4:14pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add a section to prohibit any exemption to an issuer if the issuer or affiliate of the issuer has withheld information from Congress relevant to its investigation of any collusion between persons associated with the Russian Government and persons associated with a presidential campaign.
04/04/2017-4:13pm House Mr. Swalwell (CA) moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Financial Services. (text: CR H2675)
04/04/2017-4:13pm House H.Amdt.107 By unanimous consent, the Polis amendment was withdrawn.
04/04/2017-4:10pm House DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 240, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Polis amendment.
04/04/2017-4:10pm House H.Amdt.107 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Polis. (consideration: CR H2675; text: CR H2675)
04/04/2017-3:09pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1343.
04/04/2017-3:07pm House Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1343 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed.
04/04/2017-3:07pm House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 240. (consideration: CR H2667-2678)
04/04/2017-2:31pm House Rule H. Res. 240 passed House.
04/03/2017-6:41pm House Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 240 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1343 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed.
03/29/2017 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 42.
03/29/2017 House Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-71.
Action By: House Financial Services
03/09/2017 House Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 48 - 11.
Action By: House Financial Services
03/09/2017 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. Markup report CQ
Action By: House Financial Services
03/02/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
03/02/2017 House Introduced in House

Titles (7)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House:

Encouraging Employee Ownership Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House:

Encouraging Employee Ownership Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced:

Encouraging Employee Ownership Act of 2017

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To direct the Securities and Exchange Commission to revise its rules so as to increase the threshold amount for requiring issuers to provide certain disclosures relating to compensatory benefit plans.


Subjects (6)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Employee benefits and pensions
  • Financial services and investments
  • Securities
  • Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services03/02/2017 Referred to
03/09/2017 Markup by
03/29/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-71
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs04/05/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (3)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.