There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To repeal the rule issued by the Federal Highway Administration and the Federal Transit Administration entitled "Metropolitan Planning Organization Coordination and Planning Area Reform".


Actions Overview (2)

Date
04/06/2017Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-85.
03/02/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
06/19/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held and Ordered to be Reported Prior to Referral See P.L. 115-33 (S. 496) for further action.
04/06/2017Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 49.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2017Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-85.
03/29/2017Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
03/29/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/29/2017Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Discharged.
03/03/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/02/2017Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/02/2017 Referred to
03/29/2017 Markup by
04/06/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-85
06/19/2017 No Value
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit03/03/2017 Referred to
03/29/2017 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1346. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (04/06/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

(Sec. 1) This bill nullifies the Federal Highway Administration's and the Federal Transit Administration's rule published on December 20, 2016, that revises transportation planning regulations with regard to the alignment of planning regulations with statutory provisions relating to the establishment of metropolitan planning area boundaries and the designation of metropolitan planning organizations.