There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Wilderness Act to ensure that the use of bicycles, wheelchairs, strollers, and game carts is not prohibited in Wilderness Areas, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
11/16/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1032.
03/02/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
11/16/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 805.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/16/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1032.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/13/2017Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 18.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/13/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/12/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/12/2017Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/07/2017Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
03/15/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/02/2017Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 06/07/2017
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 06/07/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/02/2017 Referred to
12/13/2017 Markup by
11/16/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1032
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands03/15/2017 Referred to
12/07/2017 Hearings by
12/12/2017 Discharged from

As of 12/14/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1349 - To amend the Wilderness Act to ensure that the use of bicycles, wheelchairs, strollers, and game carts is not prohibited in Wilderness Areas, and for other purposes..


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1349. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/02/2017)

This bill amends the Wilderness Act to declare that provisions of such Act prohibiting the use of motorized vehicles, aircraft, or other forms of mechanical transport shall not prohibit the use of motorized wheelchairs, non-motorized wheelchairs, non-motorized bicycles, strollers, wheelbarrows, survey wheels, or game carts within any wilderness areas.