There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for the non-application of Medicare competitive acquisition rates to complex rehabilitative wheelchairs and accessories.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/02/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
03/17/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/02/2017Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2017Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (104)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/02/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 03/02/2017
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 03/02/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/02/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/07/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/07/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/07/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/09/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 03/09/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/16/2017
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 03/16/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/17/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/17/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/22/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 03/23/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/03/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/04/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/25/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/25/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/25/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/27/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/27/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 04/27/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/27/2017
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/27/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/01/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/01/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/01/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/16/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/16/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/16/2017
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/16/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/16/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 05/17/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/17/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 05/17/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/17/2017
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 05/18/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/18/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/18/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 05/18/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/18/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/18/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/19/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 05/22/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/22/2017
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/22/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/22/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/22/2017
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 05/23/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/23/2017
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/23/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/23/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 05/23/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 05/24/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 05/24/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 05/25/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 05/25/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/25/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/26/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 05/26/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/26/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/06/2017
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/06/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 06/06/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/06/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/06/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 06/07/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/07/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/12/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/12/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/12/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 06/12/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/13/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/13/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/15/2017
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 06/20/2017
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 06/20/2017
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 06/20/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/20/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 06/20/2017
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 06/20/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/21/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 06/21/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/21/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 06/22/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/29/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/26/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/02/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/17/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/02/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1361. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/02/2017)

This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to prohibit the application of Medicare competitive acquisition rates to complex rehabilitative wheelchairs and accessories. (A competitive bidding program has replaced the use of established fee schedule amounts to determine payments under Medicare for certain durable medical equipment such as wheelchairs.)