There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To name the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Pago Pago, American Samoa, the Faleomavaega Eni Fa'aua'a Hunkin VA Clinic.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
03/31/2017Became Public Law No: 115-16. (TXT | PDF)
03/31/2017Signed by President.
03/21/2017Presented to President.
03/15/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
03/15/2017Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1848)
03/07/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 2 (Roll no. 127).(text: CR H1545-1546)
03/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
03/31/2017Became Public Law No: 115-16. (TXT | PDF)
03/31/2017Signed by President.
03/21/2017HousePresented to President.
03/15/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/15/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
03/15/2017SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1848)
03/08/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
03/07/2017-6:57pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/07/2017-6:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 2 (Roll no. 127). (text: CR H1545-1546)
03/07/2017-6:35pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1571)
03/07/2017-5:13pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/07/2017-5:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1362.
03/07/2017-5:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1545-1547)
03/07/2017-5:01pmHouseMrs. Radewagen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/06/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
03/06/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/06/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/06/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health03/06/2017 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs03/08/2017 Referred to
03/15/2017 Discharged from

As of 10/20/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1362 - To name the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Pago Pago, American Samoa, the Faleomavaega Eni Fa'aua'a Hunkin VA Clinic..


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.1362. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-16 (03/31/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House passed version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) This bill designates the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Pago Pago, American Samoa, as the "Faleomavaega Eni Fa'aua'a Hunkin VA Clinic."