There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Department of Homeland Security Acquisition Innovation Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Department of Homeland Security Acquisition Innovation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Homeland Security Acquisition Innovation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require certain acquisition innovation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/24/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 424 - 0 (Roll no. 193).(text: CR H2307)
03/20/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-48.
03/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
03/27/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
03/24/2017-11:12amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/24/2017-11:12amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 424 - 0 (Roll no. 193). (text: CR H2307)
03/24/2017-11:03amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2392)
03/22/2017-12:58pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Donovan objected to the Yea - Nay vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
03/22/2017-12:51pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1365.
03/22/2017-12:51pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2307-2308)
03/22/2017-12:51pmHouseMr. Donovan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/20/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 28.
03/20/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-48.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/08/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/08/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/06/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
03/06/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/06/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security03/06/2017 Referred to
03/08/2017 Markup by
03/20/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-48
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs03/27/2017 Referred to

As of 04/26/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1365 - Department of Homeland Security Acquisition Innovation Act.


Subjects (8)

  • Congressional oversight
  • Department of Homeland Security
  • Federal officials
  • Performance measurement
  • Public contracts and procurement
  • Public-private cooperation
  • Small business

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1365. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (03/24/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on March 20, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Department of Homeland Security Acquisition Innovation Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to authorize the Department of Homeland Security's (DHS's) Under Secretary for Management to:

  • designate an individual within DHS to manage DHS acquisition innovation efforts,
  • test emerging acquisition best practicess,
  • develop and distribute best practices and lessons learned regarding acquisition innovations,
  • establish metrics to measure the effectiveness of acquisition innovation efforts, and
  • determine impacts of acquisition innovation efforts on the private sector by obtaining feedback from it and incorporating such feedback into future acquisition innovation efforts.

The bill requires DHS, by 90 days after it submits the annual budget justification for DHS for each of FY2018-FY2022, to provide information to specified congressional committees on:

  • emerging acquisition best practices that were tested within DHS,
  • efforts to distribute best practices and lessons learned within DHS,
  • utilization of best practices by DHS components,
  • performance as measured by the metrics established under this bill,
  • outcomes of efforts to distribute best practices and lessons learned within DHS,
  • impacts of the utilization of innovative acquisition mechanisms by DHS on the private sector,
  • the criteria used to identify specific acquisition programs or activities to be included in acquisition innovation efforts and the outcomes of such programs or activities, and
  • recommendations to enhance acquisition innovation in DHS.