There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Arbitration Fairness Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 9 of the United States Code with respect to arbitration.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/07/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/17/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/07/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/07/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (82)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/07/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/07/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/09/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/09/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/09/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 03/09/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 03/15/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/22/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 08/25/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/01/2017
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/01/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/03/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/04/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 10/12/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 10/31/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/31/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 11/06/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/21/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/21/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 11/29/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/30/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/16/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/07/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/01/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/01/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/21/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/22/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 05/22/2018
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/22/2018
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/22/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 05/22/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/22/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/22/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/22/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/22/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/22/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/01/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/01/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/14/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 11/27/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/07/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law03/17/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1374. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/07/2017)

Arbitration Fairness Act of 2017

This bill prohibits a predispute arbitration agreement from being valid or enforceable if it requires arbitration of an employment, consumer, antitrust, or civil rights dispute.

The validity and enforceability of an agreement to arbitrate shall be determined by a court, under federal law, rather than an arbitrator, irrespective of whether the party resisting arbitration challenges the arbitration agreement specifically or in conjunction with other terms of the contract containing such agreement.

Nothing in this bill applies to arbitration provisions in a contract between an employer and a labor organization or between labor organizations, except that no such arbitration provision shall have the effect of waiving the right of an employee to seek judicial enforcement of a right arising under the U.S. Constitution, a state constitution, a federal or state statute, or related public policy.