There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Mobile Workforce State Income Tax Simplification Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Mobile Workforce State Income Tax Simplification Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Mobile Workforce State Income Tax Simplification Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To limit the authority of States to tax certain income of employees for employment duties performed in other States.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/20/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4947)
06/15/2017 Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-180.
03/07/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
06/21/2017 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
06/20/2017-3:34pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/20/2017-3:34pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4947)
06/20/2017-3:07pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1393.
06/20/2017-3:07pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4947-4951)
06/20/2017-3:07pm House Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/15/2017 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 121.
06/15/2017 House Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-180.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/22/2017 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/22/2017 House Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 2.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/17/2017 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/07/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
03/07/2017 House Introduced in House

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/07/2017
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/09/2017
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/10/2017
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/13/2017
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/13/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/13/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 03/16/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 03/20/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/20/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 03/20/2017
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 03/20/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/21/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/21/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 03/21/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 03/23/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/28/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/25/2017
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 04/25/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/26/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 04/26/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/22/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/25/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 05/25/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/25/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/25/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/25/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/06/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 06/06/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/06/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/06/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/06/2017
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/12/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 06/12/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 06/12/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 06/13/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/07/2017 Referred to
03/22/2017 Markup by
06/15/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-180
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law03/17/2017 Referred to
Senate Finance06/21/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (4)

  • Employment taxes
  • Intergovernmental relations
  • State and local taxation

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1393. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (06/20/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on June 15, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Mobile Workforce State Income Tax Simplification Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill prohibits the wages or other remuneration earned by an employee who performs employment duties in more than one state from being subject to income tax in any state other than: (1) the state of the employee's residence, and (2) the state within which the employee is present and performing employment duties for more than 30 days during the calendar year in which the wages or other remuneration is earned.

The bill exempts employers from state income tax withholding and information reporting requirements for employees not subject to income tax in the state under this bill. For the purposes of determining penalties related to an employer's state income tax withholding or reporting requirements, an employer may rely on an employee's annual determination of the time expected to be spent working in a state in the absence of fraud or collusion by such employee.

For the purposes of this bill, the term "employee" excludes: professional athletes; professional entertainers; production employees who perform services in connection with certain film, television, or other commercial video productions; and public figures who are persons of prominence who perform services for wages or other remuneration on a per-event basis.

(Sec. 3) The bill takes effect on January 1 of the second calendar year that begins after the enactment of this bill. The bill does not apply to any tax obligation that accrues before the effective date.