There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize, direct, facilitate, and expedite the transfer of administrative jurisdiction of certain Federal land, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
06/22/2018Became Public Law No: 115-190. (TXT | PDF)
06/22/2018Signed by President.
06/11/2018Presented to President.
06/06/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S3264)
05/24/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-257.
07/11/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 0 (Roll no. 345).(text: CR H5404)
07/11/2017Committee on Transportation discharged.
07/11/2017Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-206, Part I.
03/07/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (28)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/22/2018Became Public Law No: 115-190. (TXT | PDF)
06/22/2018Signed by President.
06/11/2018HousePresented to President.
06/07/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/06/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3264)
05/24/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 434.
05/24/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-257.
03/08/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/14/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-504.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
07/12/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
07/11/2017-6:54pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/11/2017-6:54pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 0 (Roll no. 345). (text: CR H5404)
07/11/2017-6:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5417)
07/11/2017-4:51pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/11/2017-4:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1397.
07/11/2017-4:44pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5404)
07/11/2017-4:44pmHouseMr. LaHood moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/11/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 143.
07/11/2017HouseCommittee on Transportation discharged.
07/11/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-206, Part I.
06/27/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/27/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/16/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/08/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/07/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/07/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/07/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/07/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/07/2017 Referred to
06/27/2017 Markup by
07/11/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-206
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands03/16/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/07/2017 Referred to
07/11/2017 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit03/08/2017 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/12/2017 Referred to
03/08/2018 Markup by
05/24/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-257
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks02/14/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1397. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-190 (06/22/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill transfers administrative jurisdiction over:

  • 0.342 acres of federal land within the boundary of the George Washington Memorial Parkway from the Department of the Interior to the Department of Transportation (DOT), and
  • 0.479 acres of federal land within the boundary of the Turner-Fairbank Highway Research Center of the Federal Highway Administration (FHA) adjacent to the parkway from DOT to Interior.

Interior shall prohibit the storage, construction, or installation of any items that may interfere with access by the research center to certain land within the parkway boundary.