There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Birthright Citizenship Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend section 301 of the Immigration and Nationality Act to clarify those classes of individuals born in the United States who are nationals and citizens of the United States at birth.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
01/23/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/03/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 01/04/2017
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/06/2017
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 01/06/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 01/09/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/20/2017
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/20/2017
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/30/2017
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/06/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 02/07/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/15/2017
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/24/2017
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 04/25/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/28/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/02/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 05/08/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 05/16/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/06/2017
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/27/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 07/18/2017
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 07/27/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/27/2017
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/18/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 10/11/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/11/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/16/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 10/16/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 11/30/2017
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 11/30/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 12/01/2017
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/01/2017
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 12/13/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/12/2018
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 06/21/2018
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/21/2018
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 06/21/2018
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 06/21/2018
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/10/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary01/03/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security01/23/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.140.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.140. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2017)

Birthright Citizenship Act of 2017

This bill amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to consider a person born in the United States "subject to the jurisdiction" of the United States for citizenship at birth purposes if the person is born in the United States of parents, one of whom is: (1) a U.S. citizen or national, (2) a lawful permanent resident alien whose residence is in the United States, or (3) an alien performing active service in the U.S. Armed Forces.

This Act shall not be construed to affect the citizenship or nationality status of any person born before the date of its enactment.