There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Pascua Yaqui Tribe Land Conveyance Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Pascua Yaqui Tribe Land Conveyance Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Pascua Yaqui Tribe Land Conveyance Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Pascua Yaqui Tribe Land Conveyance Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the conveyance of certain land inholdings owned by the United States to the Tucson Unified School District and to the Pascua Yaqui Tribe of Arizona.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
04/10/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-222.
07/11/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5405-5406)
07/11/2017Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-205.
03/07/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/10/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 370.
04/10/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-222.
03/08/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/07/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-502.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining
07/12/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
07/11/2017-4:57pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/11/2017-4:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5405-5406)
07/11/2017-4:52pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1404.
07/11/2017-4:52pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5405-5407)
07/11/2017-4:52pmHouseMr. LaHood moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/11/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 142.
07/11/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-205.
06/27/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/27/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/16/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/16/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/07/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
03/07/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources03/07/2017 Referred to
06/27/2017 Markup by
07/11/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-205
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands03/16/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs03/16/2017 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/12/2017 Referred to
03/08/2018 Markup by
04/10/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-222
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining02/07/2018 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.1404.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1404. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (04/10/2018)

Pascua Yaqui Tribe Land Conveyance Act

(Sec. 3) This bill declares that 39.65 acres of land are to be held in trust by the United States for the benefit of the Pascua Yaqui Tribe of Arizona, effective the day after the Tuscon Unified School District No. 1 relinquishes its interest in the land.

(Sec. 4) The United States must convey to the school district 13.24 acres of federal land in exchange for payment of the fair market value of the land and the cost of conveyance.

The school district may acquire the federal reversionary interest in 27.5 acres of district land by paying the appraised value, plus the costs of appraisal and conveyance, to the Department of the Interior.

(Sec. 5) Gaming is prohibited on the land taken into trust pursuant to this bill.

(Sec. 6) There are no federal reserved water rights for the land taken into trust. The tribe retains state water rights for this land. Water rights for this land may not be forfeited or abandoned.