There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Visa and Protection Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of Homeland Security to establish a veterans visa program to permit veterans who have been removed from the United States to return as immigrants, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/07/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
04/05/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
03/17/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/07/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/07/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/07/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/07/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/07/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 03/07/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 03/07/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 03/13/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/13/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 03/13/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/13/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/17/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/17/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 03/17/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 03/17/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 03/17/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/17/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 03/17/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 03/17/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/17/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/20/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/20/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/24/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/24/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 03/24/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/28/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/28/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/26/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 04/26/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 05/02/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/02/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 05/03/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/03/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 05/17/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/17/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/18/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/22/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/25/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/12/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/12/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/12/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/21/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/21/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 06/26/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 10/05/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 10/05/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/05/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/26/2018
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/26/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 04/26/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/09/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/09/2018

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/07/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security03/17/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services03/07/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel04/05/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs03/07/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1405. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/07/2017)

Veterans Visa and Protection Act of 2017

This bill requires the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to: (1) establish a program to permit eligible deported noncitizen veterans to enter the United States as, and to permit eligible noncitizen veterans in the United States to adjust their status to that of, a noncitizen lawfully admitted for permanent residence; and (2) cancel the removal of eligible noncitizen veterans and allow them to similarly adjust their status.

An "eligible" veteran is a veteran who: (1) was not ordered removed, or removed, from the United States due to a criminal conviction for a crime of violence or for a crime that endangers U.S. national security for which the noncitizen served at least five years' imprisonment; and (2) is not inadmissible to, or deportable from, the United States due to such a conviction. DHS may waive such eligibility requirements for humanitarian purposes, to assure family unity, due to exceptional service in the U.S. Armed Forces, or if such waiver otherwise is in the public interest.

A noncitizen veteran or service member shall not be removed from the United States unless he or she has a criminal conviction for a crime of violence.

A noncitizen who has obtained the status of a noncitizen lawfully admitted for permanent residence under this bill shall be eligible for naturalization through service in the U.S. Armed Forces, except that: (1) the grounds on which the noncitizen was ordered removed from, or rendered inadmissible to or deportable from, the United States shall be disregarded when determining whether the noncitizen is a person of good moral character; and (2) any period of absence from the United States due to the noncitizen having been removed or being inadmissible shall be disregarded when determining if the noncitizen satisfies any requirement relating to continuous residence or physical presence.

A noncitizen who has obtained the status of a noncitizen lawfully admitted for permanent residence under this bill shall be eligible for all military and veterans benefits for which the individual would have been eligible if he or she had never been been removed from, or voluntarily departed, the United States.

DHS shall: (1) identify cases involving service members and veterans at risk of removal from the United States, and (2) annotate all DHS immigration and naturalization records relating to any noncitizen involved and afford an opportunity to track the outcome.