There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Cancer Drug Parity Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to require group and individual health insurance coverage and group health plans to provide for cost sharing for oral anticancer drugs on terms no less favorable than the cost sharing provided for anticancer medications administered by a health care provider.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/07/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/17/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/07/2017 Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/07/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (114)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/07/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1]* 03/07/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/07/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3]* 03/07/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 03/07/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/13/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/13/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/13/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/20/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/20/2017
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/20/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/20/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/22/2017
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/22/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 03/22/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 03/27/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/03/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 04/25/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/25/2017
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 04/25/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 04/25/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/25/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/25/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 04/25/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/25/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 04/25/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/25/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/03/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/03/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/03/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 05/03/2017
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/03/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/17/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/17/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/17/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/17/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/17/2017
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/17/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/17/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 05/17/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/22/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/22/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/22/2017
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/22/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/06/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/06/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 06/06/2017
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 06/06/2017
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/06/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/06/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 06/27/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 06/27/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/11/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 07/11/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/11/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 07/11/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/08/2017
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 09/08/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 09/08/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/08/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/12/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 09/12/2017
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 09/25/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/25/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 09/25/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/25/2017
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 09/25/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/25/2017
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/25/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 09/25/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/26/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/26/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/03/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/03/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/03/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/03/2017
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 10/03/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/03/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 10/03/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/03/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 10/03/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 10/03/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/24/2017
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 10/24/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/24/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/24/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/14/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 11/14/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 11/14/2017
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/14/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/07/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/17/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

As of 11/18/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1409 - Cancer Drug Parity Act of 2017.

Subjects (6)

  • Cancer
  • Drug therapy
  • Health care costs and insurance
  • Health care coverage and access
  • Prescription drugs

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1409. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/07/2017)

Cancer Drug Coverage Act of 2017

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to require group and individual health plans that cover anticancer medications administered by a health care provider to provide no less favorable cost sharing for patient-administered anticancer medications. This requirement applies to medication approved by the Food and Drug Administration that is prescribed based on a finding by the treating physician that the medication is medically necessary for cancer treatment and is clinically appropriate in terms of type, frequency, extent site, and duration.

To comply with this requirement, health plans may not, for anticancer medications: (1) change or replace benefits to increase out-of-pocket costs; (2) reclassify benefits to increase costs; or (3) apply more restrictive limitations to orally administered medications than to intravenously administered or injected medications.