There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Transparent Summer Flounder Quotas Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To continue in effect for the 2017 and 2018 fishing seasons certain fishing specifications for the summer flounder fishery, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/07/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
04/03/2017Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans
03/16/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/07/2017Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/07/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/07/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 04/02/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources03/07/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans03/16/2017 Referred to
04/03/2017 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.1411.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1411. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/07/2017)

Transparent Summer Flounder Quotas Act

This bill addresses rules governing summer flounder fisheries.

As applicable to summer flounder, the rule submitted by the National Marine Fisheries Service (NMFS) titled "Fisheries of the Northeastern United States; Summer Flounder, Scup, and Black Sea Bass Fisheries; 2017-2018 Summer Flounder Specifications and Announcement of 2017 Summer Flounder and Black Sea Bass Commercial Accountability Measures" is nullified. The rule published in the Federal Register on December 22, 2016, establishes summer flounder quotas for the 2017-2018 recreational and commercial fishing seasons.

The prior regulations governing summer flounder shall apply until the NMFS completes a new summer flounder stock assessment and establishes a new rule based on the stock assessment. (The prior regulations titled "Fisheries of the Northeastern United States; Summer Flounder, Scup, and Black Sea Bass Fisheries; 2016-2018 Summer Flounder, Scup, and Black Sea Bass Specifications" were published in the Federal Register on December 28, 2015, and effective as of January 1, 2016.)