There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

American Law Enforcement Heroes Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

American Law Enforcement Heroes Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to authorize COPS grantees to use grant funds to hire veterans as career law enforcement officers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/16/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4210)
03/08/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
05/17/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
05/16/2017-4:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/16/2017-4:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4210)
05/16/2017-4:48pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1428.
05/16/2017-4:48pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4210-4211)
05/16/2017-4:48pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/17/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/08/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
03/08/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/20/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/25/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/08/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations03/17/2017 Referred to
Senate Judiciary05/17/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1428. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/16/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

American Law Enforcement Heroes Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to include as an allowable use of grant funds under the Community Oriented Policing Services program prioritizing the hiring and training of veterans as career law enforcement officers.