There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

HONEST Act
Honest and Open New EPA Science Treatment Act of

Short Titles as Reported to House

HONEST Act
Honest and Open New EPA Science Treatment Act of

Short Titles as Introduced

HONEST Act
Honest and Open New EPA Science Treatment Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the Environmental Protection Agency from proposing, finalizing, or disseminating regulations or assessments based upon science that is not transparent or reproducible.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/29/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 228 - 194 (Roll no. 206).(text: CR H2536)
03/24/2017 Reported by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 115-59.
03/08/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
03/30/2017 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
03/29/2017-4:55pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/29/2017-4:55pm House On passage Passed by recorded vote: 228 - 194 (Roll no. 206). (text: CR H2536)
03/29/2017-4:45pm House On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 189 - 232 (Roll no. 205).
03/29/2017-4:21pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2547-2548)
03/29/2017-2:52pm House POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the McEachin motion to recommit, the Chair put the question on adoption of the motion to recommit and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. McEachin demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on adoption of the motion to recommit until a time to be announced.
03/29/2017-2:52pm House The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
03/29/2017-2:45pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the McEachin motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to require the administrator of the EPA to use the best available science when responding to any threats to public health.
03/29/2017-2:44pm House Mr. McEachin moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
03/29/2017-2:44pm House The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
03/29/2017-1:46pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1430.
03/29/2017-1:45pm House Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1430 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
03/29/2017-1:45pm House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 229. (consideration: CR H2536-2547)
03/28/2017-3:33pm House Rule H. Res. 229 passed House.
03/27/2017-6:38pm House Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 229 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1430 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
03/24/2017 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 33.
03/24/2017 House Reported by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 115-59.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
03/09/2017 House Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 12.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
03/09/2017 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
03/08/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
03/08/2017 House Introduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology03/08/2017 Referred to
03/09/2017 Markup by
03/24/2017 Reported by
Senate Environment and Public Works03/30/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (7)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
  • Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
  • Environmental regulatory procedures
  • Government information and archives
  • Research administration and funding

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1430. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (03/29/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Honest and Open New EPA Science Treatment Act of 2017 or the HONEST Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Environmental Research, Development, and Demonstration Authorization Act of 1978 to prohibit the Environmental Protection Agency from proposing, finalizing, or disseminating a covered action unless all scientific and technical information relied on to support such action is the best available science, specifically identified, and publicly available in a manner sufficient for independent analysis and substantial reproduction of research results. A covered action includes a risk, exposure, or hazard assessment, criteria document, standard, limitation, regulation, regulatory impact analysis, or guidance. Personally identifiable information, trade secrets, or commercial or financial information obtained from a person and privileged or confidential must be redacted prior to public availability.