There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Voluntary Protection Program Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Department of Labor's voluntary protection program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/09/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/09/2017Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/09/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (59)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/09/2017
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 03/09/2017
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23]* 03/09/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/09/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/15/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 03/16/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/21/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/22/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/22/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/27/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/28/2017
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 03/28/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/06/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/26/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/26/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/11/2017
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 05/11/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 06/08/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 06/08/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/08/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/12/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/13/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/13/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/20/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/20/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 06/21/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/23/2017
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 06/26/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/27/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/28/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 07/03/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/12/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 07/25/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 08/08/2017
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 10/04/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/31/2017
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 10/31/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 11/01/2017
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/01/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 11/01/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/02/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/08/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 11/08/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 11/16/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/21/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 12/07/2017
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 12/21/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 12/21/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 01/19/2018
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 02/27/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/01/2018
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 03/01/2018
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 03/05/2018
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 03/05/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 03/05/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 03/13/2018
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/13/2018
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 03/19/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 03/21/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce03/09/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Department of Labor
  • Worker safety and health

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1444. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/09/2017)

Voluntary Protection Program Act

This bill provides statutory authority for the Occupational Safety and Health Administration's (OSHA's) voluntary protection program, under which management, labor, and OSHA establish cooperative relationships at workplaces that have implemented a comprehensive safety and health management system.