There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

MOBILE Act of 2017
Making Online Banking Initiation Legal and Easy Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish requirements for use of a driver's license or personal identification card by certain financial institutions for opening an account or obtaining a financial product or service, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
01/29/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 397 - 8 (Roll no. 46).(text: CR H644)
01/22/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-523.
03/09/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
01/30/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
01/29/2018-7:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/29/2018-7:07pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 397 - 8 (Roll no. 46). (text: CR H644)
01/29/2018-6:58pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H653-654)
01/29/2018-5:56pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
01/29/2018-5:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1457.
01/29/2018-5:46pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H644-645)
01/29/2018-5:45pmHouseMr. Tipton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
01/22/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 388.
01/22/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-523.
12/13/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 60 - 0.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
12/13/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
12/12/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
07/12/2017HouseHearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral.
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit
03/09/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
03/09/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services03/09/2017 Referred to
12/13/2017 Markup by
01/22/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-523
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit07/12/2017 Hearings by
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs01/30/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1457. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (01/29/2018)

(Sec. 1) This bill authorizes a financial institution to record personal information from a scan, copy, or image of an individual's driver's license or personal identification card and store the information electronically when an individual initiates an online request to open an account or obtain a financial product. The financial institution may use the information for the purpose of verifying the authenticity of the driver's license or identification card, verifying the identity of the individual, or complying with legal requirements.

The financial institution must delete any copy or image of an individual's driver's license or personal identification card after use.